LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB398
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB398
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB398
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/06/2023
10:00 am
Ways & Means Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 140
HB105
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB260
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB300
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
HB398
Introduced
Last Action: 03/06/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB456
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB591
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB596
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
HB623
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB796
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HJR45
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Failed of adoption
HJR47
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Local Government