Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3980 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 20, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023