1 | 1 | | 88R13813 SHH-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Reynolds H.B. No. 3988 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the creation of the Texas Advanced Research Institute. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle F, Title 4, Government Code, is amended |
---|
10 | 10 | | by adding Chapter 482 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | CHAPTER 482. TEXAS ADVANCED RESEARCH INSTITUTE |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 482.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "institute" |
---|
13 | 13 | | means the Texas Advanced Research Institute. |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 482.002. PURPOSES. The Texas Advanced Research |
---|
15 | 15 | | Institute is established in the office of the governor to: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) promote advanced research efforts in all |
---|
17 | 17 | | disciplines, including: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (A) energy; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (B) medicine; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | (C) biotechnology; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) attract, create, or expand research capabilities |
---|
22 | 22 | | of public or private institutions of higher education and other |
---|
23 | 23 | | public or private entities that will promote a substantial increase |
---|
24 | 24 | | in advanced research and development and in the creation of |
---|
25 | 25 | | inventions and patents in this state; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (3) ensure that this state invests and receives a |
---|
27 | 27 | | return on investment in advanced research and development |
---|
28 | 28 | | commensurate with the size and influence of this state's economy; |
---|
29 | 29 | | and |
---|
30 | 30 | | (4) serve as an intermediary between institutions of |
---|
31 | 31 | | higher education, the private sector, and other stakeholders to |
---|
32 | 32 | | develop the workforce of this state and equip that workforce with |
---|
33 | 33 | | skills and credentials for the jobs and professions of the future, |
---|
34 | 34 | | including technical skills. |
---|
35 | 35 | | Sec. 482.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Advanced |
---|
36 | 36 | | Research Institute is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). |
---|
37 | 37 | | Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the |
---|
38 | 38 | | institute is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2035. |
---|
39 | 39 | | Sec. 482.004. POWERS AND DUTIES. (a) The institute: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) may make grants to provide funding to public or |
---|
41 | 41 | | private persons to conduct research and development with the |
---|
42 | 42 | | objective of advancing knowledge, creating intellectual property, |
---|
43 | 43 | | and identifying commercial opportunities to monetize the products |
---|
44 | 44 | | resulting from advanced research and development; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) shall coordinate with participating public and |
---|
46 | 46 | | private persons to develop the Texas Advanced Research Plan; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (3) may support institutions of higher education, |
---|
48 | 48 | | advanced research facilities, and collaborations in this state in |
---|
49 | 49 | | all stages in the process of conducting and exploiting advanced |
---|
50 | 50 | | research and development; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (4) may establish the appropriate standards and |
---|
52 | 52 | | oversight bodies to ensure the proper use of funds authorized under |
---|
53 | 53 | | this chapter for advanced research and development; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (5) shall continuously monitor contracts and |
---|
55 | 55 | | agreements authorized by this chapter and ensure that each grant |
---|
56 | 56 | | recipient complies with the terms and conditions of the grant |
---|
57 | 57 | | contract; |
---|
58 | 58 | | (6) shall ensure that all grant proposals comply with |
---|
59 | 59 | | this chapter and rules adopted under this chapter before the |
---|
60 | 60 | | proposals are granted approval; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (7) shall establish procedures to document that the |
---|
62 | 62 | | institute, its employees, and council members appointed under this |
---|
63 | 63 | | chapter comply with all laws governing the academic peer review |
---|
64 | 64 | | process and conflicts of interest where applicable. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (b) The institute shall implement the Texas Advanced |
---|
66 | 66 | | Research Plan and continually monitor and revise the plan as |
---|
67 | 67 | | necessary. |
---|
68 | 68 | | Sec. 482.005. LEADERSHIP, STAFF, AND RESOURCES. (a) The |
---|
69 | 69 | | institute is governed by a council of nine members appointed by the |
---|
70 | 70 | | governor. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (b) Members of the council serve staggered six-year terms |
---|
72 | 72 | | with one-third of the members' terms expiring on February 1 of each |
---|
73 | 73 | | odd-numbered year. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (c) The governor shall designate a member as the president |
---|
75 | 75 | | of the council to serve in that capacity at the pleasure of the |
---|
76 | 76 | | governor. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (d) The office of the governor shall provide the institute |
---|
78 | 78 | | with necessary staff and resources to perform the institute's |
---|
79 | 79 | | duties under this chapter. |
---|
80 | 80 | | Sec. 482.006. DUTIES OF COUNCIL. (a) The council shall |
---|
81 | 81 | | select the recipients of any grants awarded by the institute. |
---|
82 | 82 | | (b) The council may conduct surveys, research, or |
---|
83 | 83 | | investigations for the purposes of the institute. |
---|
84 | 84 | | Sec. 482.007. MEETINGS. The council shall meet at least |
---|
85 | 85 | | once each year at the call of the president. |
---|
86 | 86 | | Sec. 482.008. FUNDING. (a) The institute may receive |
---|
87 | 87 | | state-appropriated funds for the purpose of supporting the |
---|
88 | 88 | | activities of the institute. |
---|
89 | 89 | | (b) The institute may solicit, accept, and use gifts, |
---|
90 | 90 | | grants, and donations from public and private sources for the |
---|
91 | 91 | | purposes of this chapter, subject only to limitations contained in |
---|
92 | 92 | | the gifts, grants, or donations. |
---|
93 | 93 | | (c) The institute may receive funding in the form of |
---|
94 | 94 | | royalties, license fees, and profits resulting from inventions, |
---|
95 | 95 | | discoveries, and products developed by or in partnership with, or |
---|
96 | 96 | | coordinated through, the institute. |
---|
97 | 97 | | SECTION 2. In appointing the initial members of the council |
---|
98 | 98 | | of the Texas Advanced Research Institute, the governor shall |
---|
99 | 99 | | appoint three members for terms expiring February 1, 2025, three |
---|
100 | 100 | | members for terms expiring February 1, 2027, and three members for |
---|
101 | 101 | | terms expiring February 1, 2029. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|