E
|
06/11/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/11/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4560
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#345
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|