LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3997
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3997
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3997
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/27/2023
10:00 am
Higher Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
HB683
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
HB989
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1595
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
HB1604
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
HB1912
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2026
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2132
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
HB2804
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
HB4434
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
HB4437
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Left pending in committee
HJR3
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
HB3997
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule