Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1862 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4132 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1607 | Journal Page: 4131 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4131 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4131 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4006 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4006 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3469 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 291 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |