Senate | 05/22/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2324 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2058 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1499 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2689 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#850 | Journal Page: 2688 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2552 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Amended | 2-Slawson | Journal Page: 2551 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1602 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1602 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed |