Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1036 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1544 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#237 | Journal Page: 1543 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1543 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1543 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1513 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1513 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 767 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed |