By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 4073 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023; April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government; May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the renewal of certain expired certificates issued by the Texas Commission on Fire Protection; authorizing a fee. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 419.0341, Government Code, is amended by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to read as follows: (e) If the person's certificate has been expired for more than five years [one year or longer], the person may not renew the certificate. The person may obtain a new certificate by submitting to the proficiency examination or repeating the requirements and procedures for obtaining an original certificate. The commission shall charge a fee to cover the cost of administering the proficiency examination. (e-1) If the person's certificate has been expired for more than one year but not more than five years, the person may renew the certificate in accordance with rules established by the commission. The commission by rule shall establish: (1) a system for renewing a certificate under this subsection; (2) a list of criteria a person must satisfy to renew a certificate under this subsection; and (3) a fee for renewing a certificate under this subsection. SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to a certificate that expires in accordance with rules adopted by the Texas Commission on Fire Protection under Section 419.033, Government Code, on or after January 1, 2024. A certificate that expires before January 1, 2024, is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2024, the Texas Commission on Fire Protection shall adopt rules providing for the renewal of a certificate under Section 419.0341(e-1), Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *