House | 05/12/2023 | Postponed | 6/1/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 4174 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 10(b) | Journal Page: 4174 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4174 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1648 | Journal Page: 4174 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | 1-Hinojosa | Journal Page: 4173 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4173 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4036 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 10(b) | Journal Page: 4036 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4035 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 769 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 769 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed |