Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4161 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/08/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R14242 MLH-D
 By: Gervin-Hawkins H.B. No. 4161


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedures for providing notice to certain
 individuals on placement of a child in the managing conservatorship
 of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 262.1095, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (d), (d-1), and (e) and adding Subsections
 (d-2) and (f) to read as follows:
 (d)  The department shall:
 (1)  begin identifying and locating individuals
 described by Subsection (a) not later than 24 hours after the
 department files a suit affecting the parent-child relationship;
 and
 (2)  use due diligence to identify and locate all
 individuals described by Subsection (a) not later than 72 hours
 [the 30th day] after [the date] the department files a suit
 affecting the parent-child relationship.
 (d-1)  In order to identify and locate the individuals
 described by Subsection (a), the department shall seek information
 from:
 (1)  each parent, relative, and alleged father of the
 child; and
 (2)  the child in an age-appropriate manner.
 (d-2) [(d-1)]  Immediately after the Department of Family
 and Protective Services identifies and locates an individual
 described by Subsection (a)(1), the department shall provide the
 information required by this section.
 (e)  The failure of a parent or alleged father of the child to
 complete the proposed child placement resources form does not
 relieve the department of its duty to seek information about the
 person under Subsection (d-1) [(d)].
 (f)  Not later than 120 hours after the department files a
 suit affecting the parent-child relationship, the department shall
 report to the child's state representative, the child's state
 senator, and the governor:
 (1)  whether the department:
 (A)  identified all of the individuals related to
 the child within the fourth degree by consanguinity as determined
 under Chapter 573, Government Code; and
 (B)  contacted each individual and provided the
 information required by Subsection (a); and
 (2)  the reason the department failed to contact an
 individual described by Subdivision (1)(A).
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than April 1, 2024, the Department
 of Family and Protective Services shall report to the legislature
 the following information for cases in which the department was
 named managing conservator of a child after September 1, 2023, but
 before February 1, 2024:
 (1)  the total percentage of individuals identified as
 being related to the child within the fourth degree by
 consanguinity as determined under Chapter 573, Government Code, the
 department was unable to contact as required by Section 262.1095,
 Family Code, and the reason the department was unable to contact
 each individual;
 (2)  the percentage of children in the conservatorship
 of the department who were placed with a relative or other
 designated caregiver;
 (3)  the percentage of children in the conservatorship
 of the department who were placed in foster care;
 (4)  the total number of children in the
 conservatorship of the department who were placed with a relative
 or other designated caregiver;
 (5)  the total number of children in the
 conservatorship of the department who were placed in foster care
 and, for each child, the reasons the department did not place the
 child with a relative or other designated caregiver; and
 (6)  any legislative or other recommendations to ensure
 the department contacts all of a child's relatives identified under
 Section 262.1095, Family Code.
 (b)  Not later than November 1, 2024, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall report to the legislature the
 information described by Subsection (a) of this section for all
 cases in which the department was named managing conservator of a
 child during the fiscal year ending August 31, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.