Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1744 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 05/07/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3469 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3293 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1204 | Journal Page: 3292 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3292 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3292 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 3190 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1934 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1744 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed |