House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1390 | Journal Page: 3640 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/9/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3447 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3447 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 321 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 321 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |