Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4219 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 22, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023