Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4233 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zwiener, Frank, Garcia H.B. No. 4233
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training regarding runaway prevention for certain
 individuals who provide care for children in the conservatorship of
 the Department of Family and Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 264.015, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  Each foster parent, prospective adoptive parent, and
 relative or other designated caregiver who provide care for
 children and youth in the conservatorship of the department who are
 10 years of age or older shall complete a training program on:
 (1)  runaway prevention measures; and
 (2)  proper procedures in the event a child or youth
 runs away from the provider.
 (e)  The training under Subsection (d) may be:
 (1)  offered to providers who provide care for children
 in the conservatorship of the department who are younger than 10
 years of age who have a history of running away;
 (2)  included as part of existing licensing training
 provided by the department or contracted residential child-care
 providers; and
 (3)  offered in lieu of required training that is not
 relevant based on the age of the children for whom the person will
 be providing care.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *