Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
05/07/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3249
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Rogers
|
Journal Page: 3249
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3249
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2601
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
Journal Page: 2601
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|