Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB430 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 430
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BettencourtX
 SpringerX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 NicholsX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the criteria and qualifications for distributions under
 the rural volunteer fire department assistance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 614.102(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The director shall:
 (1)  determine reasonable criteria and qualifications
 for the distribution of money from the volunteer fire department
 assistance fund, including:
 (A)  the frequency, size, and severity of past
 wildfires in a volunteer fire department's jurisdiction;
 (B)  the potential for loss or damage to property
 resulting from future wildfires in the department's jurisdiction;
 [and]
 (C)  the age of the equipment used by the
 department; and
 (D)  the department's need for emergency
 assistance under Section 614.103(a-1); and
 (2)  establish a procedure for reporting and processing
 requests for money from the fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *