Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4333 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023