Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1710 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3860 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3559 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1334 | Journal Page: 3558 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3558 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3558 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3428 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1283 | Journal Page: 3427 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3427 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3427 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 801 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |