Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1710 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3533 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1312 | Journal Page: 3533 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3533 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Amended | 1-K. Bell | Journal Page: 3532 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3532 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3393 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1268 | Journal Page: 3393 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3393 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Amended | 4-Zwiener | Journal Page: 3392 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Amended 4-Zwiener | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Amended 3-Metcalf | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3390 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Postponed | 5/8/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3080 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3080 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Postponed | 6/22/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3050 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3050 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1502 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 804 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |