Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3714
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3364
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1248
|
Journal Page: 3363
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3363
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3363
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1231
|
Journal Page: 3332
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3332
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Goldman
|
Journal Page: 3332
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3332
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 3330
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2905
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 2905
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2905
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/3/23 2:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|