LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB4445
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB4445
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4445
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/25/2023
8:00 am
Natural Resources Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
HB2735
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB2815
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2816
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3225
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4184
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4445
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
SB1188
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB5373
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HB5395
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
HB5406
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Received from the House