E | 06/18/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 6492 | |
E | 05/24/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5620 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
House | 05/21/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4998 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4832 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2065 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1922 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1627 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1091 | Journal Page: 3092 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3021 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 3021 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3021 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3020 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 807 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |