Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1627 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3124 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1124 | Journal Page: 3123 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3123 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3123 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3050 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3050 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 807 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |