Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4495 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023 10:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/16/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/16/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee