LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB452
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB452
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB452
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/22/2023
8:00 am
Land & Resource Management Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.028
HB14
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB376
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
HB452
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB783
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB866
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
HB1025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 S Received from the House
HB1286
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB1526
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1922
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB2239
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
HB2571
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2732
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2970
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Left pending in committee