Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1823 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3921 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1532 | Journal Page: 3921 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3921 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3920 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3845 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1480 | Journal Page: 3844 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3844 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3844 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1928 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 823 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |