Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 20, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 22, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023