Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 16, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023