Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1129 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#353 | Journal Page: 1745 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 324 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |