Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 21, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023