Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4621 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

                    By: Bhojani, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 4621
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2023;
 May 16, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4621 By:  Hughes


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HughesX
 PaxtonX
 BettencourtX
 BirdwellX
 LaMantiaX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority to cancel certain elections on a measure.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 2, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2.083 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2.083.  CANCELLATION OF ELECTION DURING DECLARED
 DISASTER. (a) In this section, "disaster" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 418.004, Government Code.
 (b)  The authority that ordered an election on a measure may
 request approval from the secretary of state to cancel the election
 if:
 (1)  the governor issued a disaster declaration for a
 disaster under Chapter 418, Government Code, covering an area
 within the authority's jurisdiction; and
 (2)  the authority determines that the disaster makes
 holding the election impossible.
 (c)  In determining whether to grant a request to cancel an
 election on a measure under this section, the secretary of state
 shall consider the circumstances of the disaster in the affected
 area, including whether other elections in or near the area can be
 conducted.
 (d)  If the secretary of state grants a request to cancel an
 election on a measure under this section, the authority holding the
 election shall post notice of the cancellation during early voting
 by personal appearance and on election day, at each polling place
 that would have been used for the election on the measure.
 (e)  If an election on a measure required following the
 submission of a petition signed by a number of registered voters is
 canceled under this section, the authority that ordered the
 election shall order a new election on the measure for the first
 available uniform election day after the canceled election.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *