Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4621 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 9, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023