E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6422
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6428
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5460
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2105
|
Journal Page: 5460
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5460
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4996
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4049
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3759
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1430
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Goldman
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3677
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|