House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed | 6/1/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3815 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3815 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 325 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 325 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |