LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB4666
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB4666
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4666
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/01/2023
10:00 am
Higher Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
HB3296
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3371
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Reported from s/c with no recommendation
HB4666
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Left pending in committee
SB15
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1429
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23