House | 05/05/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3157 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1839 | Journal Page: 3157 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Postponed | 5/5/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2559 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 835 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 835 | |
House | 03/10/2023 | Filed |