Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4746 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/29/2023 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Received from the House