Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4784 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R13423 KBB-F
 By: Anchía H.B. No. 4784


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of electricity service in the ERCOT power
 region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.101(b), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A customer is entitled:
 (1)  to be informed about rights and opportunities in
 the transition to a competitive electric industry;
 (2)  to choose the customer's retail electric provider
 consistent with this chapter, to have that choice honored, and to
 assume that the customer's chosen provider will not be changed
 without the customer's informed consent;
 (3)  to have access to providers of energy efficiency
 services, to on-site distributed generation, and to providers of
 energy generated by renewable energy resources;
 (4)  to be served by a provider of last resort that
 offers a commission-approved standard service package;
 (5)  to receive sufficient information to make an
 informed choice of service provider;
 (6)  to be protected from unfair, misleading, or
 deceptive practices, including protection from being billed for
 services that were not authorized or provided; [and]
 (7)  to have an impartial and prompt resolution of
 disputes with its chosen retail electric provider and transmission
 and distribution utility;
 (8)  to participation in demand response programs
 through retail electric providers and demand response providers;
 and
 (9)  to receive notice from the retail electric
 provider that serves the customer:
 (A)  when the independent organization certified
 under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region issues an emergency
 energy alert about low operating reserves to providers of
 generation in the power region; or
 (B)  of planned outages and the length of time the
 outages are expected to last.
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In addition to meeting the demand goals provided by
 Subsection (a), each electric utility shall also meet an annual
 energy savings goal of:
 (1)  one-fourth of one percent annual energy savings in
 the 2024 calendar year;
 (2)  one-half of one percent annual energy savings in
 the 2025 calendar year;
 (3)  three-fourths of one percent annual energy savings
 in the 2026 calendar year; and
 (4)  one percent annual energy savings beginning with
 the 2027 calendar year.
 (b-2)  The commission by rule shall provide a method to
 establish each utility's annual savings goal under Subsection
 (a-1). The method must be based on the existing and expected usage
 of electricity delivered in a utility's service area that is
 required to pay the annual energy efficiency cost recovery fee. In
 adopting rules, the commission may provide for cost caps for the
 implementation of Subsection (a-1) and provide good cause
 exceptions for a utility that is unable to meet the goal in a
 cost-effective manner.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.919 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.919.  RESIDENTIAL DEMAND RESPONSE PROGRAM. (a)  The
 commission by rule shall require each retail electric provider in
 the ERCOT power region to create a residential demand response
 program to reduce the average total residential load by at least:
 (1)  one percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2024;
 (2)  two percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2025;
 (3)  three percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2026; and
 (4)  five percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2027.
 (b)  The rules must:
 (1)  ensure that demand response participation is
 reasonably available to residential customers;
 (2)  promote the use of smart metering technology;
 (3)  ensure that demand response programs are capable
 of responding to an emergency energy alert about low operating
 reserves issued by the independent organization certified under
 Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region;
 (4)  provide opportunities for demand response
 providers to contract with retail electric providers to provide
 demand response services; and
 (5)  ensure the program does not impact the critical
 needs of vulnerable populations.
 SECTION 4.  The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 adopt rules to implement the changes made by this Act to Section
 39.905, Utilities Code, not later than December 31, 2023.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.