E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6485
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6363
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6364
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2255
|
Journal Page: 6363
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6363
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6363
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5895
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5895
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3037
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3006
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3006
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3006
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5299
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6364
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3483
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3483
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 861
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|