Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4891 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/28/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs