Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1757 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3841 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1477 | Journal Page: 3840 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3840 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3839 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 3786 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3638 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3638 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/9/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3442 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3442 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 864 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 864 | |
House | 03/10/2023 | Filed |