E
|
05/27/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6429
|
E
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1411
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#681
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2367
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2367
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|