Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5067 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/03/2023 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately