Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1922
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|