E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6485
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5634
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5635
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2159
|
Journal Page: 5635
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5634
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5293
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2159
|
Journal Page: 5635
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Johnson
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote RV#1176
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|