House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |