LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB5248
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5248
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5248
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/27/2023
8:00 am
Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB4752
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB5248
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
HCR5
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
HCR29
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
HCR80
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
HCR91
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HCR104
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
HCR105
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
SB811
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1032
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23