Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5330 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Reynolds, Lalani (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 5330
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on
 Higher Education; May 22, 2023, reported favorably from Committee
 on Education by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 22, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CreightonX
 CampbellX
 BettencourtX
 BirdwellX
 FloresX
 KingX
 LaMantiaX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 SpringerX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the service area of the Houston Community College
 System District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.182, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 130.182.  HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT
 SERVICE AREA.  The service area of the Houston Community College
 System District includes the territory within:
 (1)  the Houston, Alief, Katy, Spring Branch, and North
 Forest independent school districts;
 (2)  the Stafford Municipal School District; [and]
 (3)  the part of the Fort Bend Independent School
 District that is located in the municipalities of Houston, Missouri
 City, and Pearland; and
 (4)  the part of the Fort Bend Independent School
 District that is not located in the service area of the Wharton
 County Junior College District and that is adjacent to the Houston
 Community College System District.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *