House | 04/28/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Filed |